QUEEN ELIZABETH'S HOSPITAL

Charity number: 1104871
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Independent School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
Where the charity operates:
  • Bristol City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 29 September 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

12 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
KEVIN RILEY Chair 01 September 2017
None on record
Mark Clive Wagstaffe Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
Helen Margaret England Trustee 25 September 2024
None on record
Alexis Angus Trustee 01 December 2022
None on record
JOANNA SADLER Trustee 18 October 2022
None on record
Tryphena Marie Yianni Trustee 17 February 2021
None on record
Martin Craig Jones Trustee 15 November 2019
ABLAZE A BUSINESS LEARNING ACTION ZONE FOR EDUCATION
Received: On time
JOHN EDGAR MILNE Trustee 04 April 2019
None on record
JOHN HOLLINGDALE Trustee 04 September 2018
None on record
Caroline Bateson Trustee 01 September 2017
None on record
EDWARD CORRIGAN Trustee 01 June 2016
None on record
TIMOTHY DAVIS Trustee 03 June 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Total gross income £11.03m £9.77m £10.58m £11.63m £12.38m
Total expenditure £9.00m £9.48m £9.87m £11.18m £12.06m
Income from government contracts £28.09k £27.14k £27.01k £28.41k £29.76k
Income from government grants N/A N/A £18.91k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £805.59k £169.19k £176.66k £261.96k £285.50k
Income - Other trading activities £29.99k £32.93k £21.09k £25.47k £81.86k
Income - Charitable activities £9.64m £9.06m £9.99m £10.92m £11.35m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £466.31k £354.78k £372.99k £405.57k £542.95k
Income - Other £89.90k £152.25k £18.91k £20.00k £120.00k
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £135.00k £130.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £8.83m £9.29m £9.72m £10.75m £11.86m
Expenditure - Raising funds £172.34k £184.56k £145.12k £435.79k £198.32k
Expenditure - Governance £12.87k £12.08k £12.48k £12.82k £15.04k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £108.28k £151.96k £111.55k £344.96k £100.56k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023
Own use assets £9.81m £9.80m £9.33m £9.03m £9.95m
Long-term investments £10.94m £11.20m £13.04m £12.26m £12.27m
Other assets £6.79m £6.91m £7.87m £8.62m £7.89m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £3.74m £3.53m £3.44m £3.39m £3.45m

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 19 March 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 19 March 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2022 01 March 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 01 March 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2021 04 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 04 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2020 25 March 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 25 March 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 April 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 27 April 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE CHARITY COMMISSIONERS DATED 25 AUGUST 2005 ( AS AFFECTED BY A UNITING DIRECTION MADE UNDER S.96 OF THE CHARITIES ACT 1993 AND DATED 25 AUGUST 2005.)
Charitable objects
THE OBJECT OF THE CHARITY IS TO FURTHER THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING QUEEN ELIZABETH'S HOSPITAL BY THE PROVISION OF SCHOLARSHIPS, BURSARIES AND PRIZES.
Area of benefit
QUEEN ELIZABETH'S HOSPITAL, BRISTOL.
Registration history
  • 29 September 2005 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Queen Elizabeths Hospital
Berkeley Place
Clifton
Bristol
BS8 1JX
Phone:
01179303048
Email:
No information available