BIRDS EYE VIEW

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Birds Eye View raises public awareness by positively celebrating the diverse talents of women filmmakers from around the world on all platforms, whilst inspiring, encouraging and equipping the next generation of women filmmakers and executives to break new ground through our talent development programmes.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

8 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 August 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Valeria Bullo | Chair | 01 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
Tolu Stedford | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Lisa Ines del Tufo | Trustee | 20 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Yaw Basoah | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sophie Doherty | Trustee | 11 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Fozia O'Dowd | Trustee | 11 January 2023 |
|
|
||||
Mx Tara Elizabeth Brown | Trustee | 05 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Catherine Hayward | Trustee | 05 September 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £252.72k | £302.78k | £323.32k | £292.71k | £280.38k | |
|
Total expenditure | £224.51k | £274.04k | £330.83k | £326.51k | £275.48k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.91k | £11.50k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 24 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 23 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 31/07/2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 21/06/2004 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 11/06/2002 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 02/12/2013
Charitable objects
1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE ARTS AND SCIENCES OF FILM AND FILMMAKING AND IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY IN THE ROLE OF WOMEN IN FILM AND FILMMAKING. 2) TO FURTHER ANY OTHER SIMILAR PURPOSES WHICH ARE CHARITABLE IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE LAW OF ENGLAND AND WALES FROM TIME TO TIME AS THE CHARITY THINKS FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3Space International House
6 Canterbury Crescent
London
SW9 7QE
- Phone:
- 020 7060 3168
- Email:
- tember@reclaimtheframe.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window