LEEDS WEST INDIAN CARNIVAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
A) To promote for the public benefit the arts. B) To foster, promote and increase public knowledge of the arts, particularly the encouragement of children into the heritage of the Leeds West Indian Community. C)To Secure the establishment of a community centre. D) To advance education generally, but in particular West Indian Music, dress,art and design of artifact.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 January 2024
Total income includes £59,774 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
40 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England
- Antigua And Barbuda
- Barbados
- Dominica
- St Kitts And Nevis
- Trinidad And Tobago
Governance
- 01 February 2005: Standard registration
- LWIC (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Paying staff
- Risk management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Thomas Arthur Benjamin France | Chair | 18 April 2004 |
|
|
||||
Kearn Williams | Trustee | 01 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Erica Jeffers | Trustee | 01 March 2024 |
|
|
||||
Lorina Angelica gumbs | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Simone Berkeley Miss | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Karen Mills | Trustee | 01 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Michael Bailey | Trustee | 01 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Norma Cannonier | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Howarth | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|||||
Melvyn Zakers | Trustee | 31 January 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/01/2020 | 31/01/2021 | 31/01/2022 | 31/01/2023 | 31/01/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £92.71k | £154.08k | £77.93k | £107.80k | £105.53k | |
|
Total expenditure | £90.36k | £46.32k | £108.27k | £107.59k | £122.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £61.40k | £153.24k | £77.93k | £89.62k | £59.77k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 January 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2024 | 01 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2023 | 06 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2022 | 28 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2021 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 January 2020 | 28 May 2021 | 179 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 January 2020 | 28 May 2021 | 179 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 04 MAY 2004
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE ARTS (MEANING THE VISUAL, LITERARY, MUSICAL, DRAMATIC OR ANY OTHER ARTS PROVIDED IN EACH CASE THAT THEY ARE OF RECOGNISED CULTURAL, AESTHETIC OR EDUCATIONAL VALUE); (B) TO FOSTER, PROMOTE AND INCREASE PUBLIC APPRECIATION AND KNOWLEDGE OF AND TO IMPROVE PUBLIC TASTE AND INTEREST IN THE ARTS, AND IN PARTICULAR THE ACTIVE ENCOURAGEMENT AND DEVELOPMENT OF CHILDREN INTO THE CULTURAL AND SOCIAL HERITAGE OF THE LEEDS WEST INDIAN COMMUNITY; (C) TO ESTABLISH OR SECURE THE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY CENTRE (HEREIN AFTER CALLED "THE CARNIVAL CENTRE") AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE THE SAME, WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY OR OTHER PERSON OR BODY IN FURTHERANCE OF THE OBJECTS; (D) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION GENERALLY, IN PARTICULAR CONCERNING WEST INDIAN MUSIC, DRESS, ART AND DESIGN OF ARTEFACTS; (E) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF CHAPELTOWN, LEEDS IN THE COUNTY OF WEST YORKSHIRE AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD THEREOF (HEREINAFTER CALLED THE "AREA OF BENEFIT") WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX, SEXUAL ORIENTATION, RACE OR OF A POLITICAL, RELIGIOUS OR OTHER OPINIONS, BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES, VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF LIFE OF THE SAID INHABITANTS.
Area of benefit
CHAPELTOWN, LEEDS IN THE COUNTY OF WEST YORKSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Leeds West Indian Carnival
Arts & Cultural Centre
82 Sheepscar Street North
Leeds
LS7 3AF
- Phone:
- 0113 307 0001
- Email:
- Office@leedscarnival.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window