Financial history FOCUS COUNSELLING (UK) LTD

Charity number: 1108331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £372.10k £330.79k £345.11k £399.01k £410.94k
Total expenditure £341.13k £311.73k £325.66k £392.09k £413.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A