CHARMOUTH HERITAGE COAST CENTRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of the public in geology, palaeontology, geomorphology and natural history of the coast and adjacent areas at Charmouth and to maintain a centre at Charmouth for education and information to encourage management of the coast and adjacent areas.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £10,000 from 1 government grant(s)
People

14 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Dorset
Governance
- 09 August 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
14 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Janet Coleman | Chair | 11 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Bovill | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Jane Whailing | Trustee | 25 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Guy Field | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Penelope Ann Rose | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Dr Jane Elizabeth Gregory | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|
||||
Roger Leslie Sansom | Trustee | 12 May 2022 |
|
|||||
Andrew Littler | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|||||
Paul Richard Harvey | Trustee | 29 January 2020 |
|
|
||||
Laura Cornish | Trustee | 25 January 2018 |
|
|
||||
Eden Hamilton Thomson | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
Barry Preston Coleman | Trustee | 26 May 2016 |
|
|
||||
JANET R COLEMAN | Trustee | 19 January 2015 |
|
|
||||
MRS DEBBY SNOOK | Trustee | 19 January 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £228.02k | £176.43k | £160.84k | £201.72k | £257.13k | |
|
Total expenditure | £224.14k | £169.96k | £162.15k | £225.92k | £225.71k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £22.45k | £91.50k | £42.05k | £5.00k | £10.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 15 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 07 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 06 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 03 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 9 JUNE 2004
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE GEOLOGY, PALAEONTOLOGY AND NATURAL HISTORY OF THE COAST AND ADJACENT AREAS AT CHARMOUTH AND TO MAINTAIN A CENTRE AT CHARMOUTH FOR EDUCATION AND INFORMATION TO ENCOURAGE CONSERVATION OF THE COAST AND ADJACENT AREA.
Area of benefit
DORSET
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Downside Close
Charmouth
Bridport
Dorset
DT6 6BH
- Phone:
- 01297561625
- Email:
- info@charmouth.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window