Financial history GRESHAM'S SCHOOL

Charity Number: 1105500
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £35.14m £17.40m £20.04m £28.36m £23.54m
Total expenditure £16.53m £17.03m £19.47m £21.41m £23.13m
Income from government contracts £59.00k £58.88k £134.97k £126.58k £218.87k
Income from government grants £885.00k £246.28k £468 £1.50k £3.70k
Income - Donations and legacies £19.17m £344.00k £95.00k £6.07m £120.00k
Income - Other trading activities £172.00k £262.00k £510.00k £684.00k £908.00k
Income - Charitable activities £15.67m £16.67m £19.33m £21.39m £22.26m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £122.00k £127.00k £111.00k £215.00k £255.00k
Income - Other £2.00k £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £0 £3.00k £0 £0 £20.00k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £16.30m £16.75m £18.94m £20.76m £22.39m
Expenditure - Raising funds £229.00k £287.00k £527.00k £647.00k £744.00k
Expenditure - Governance £28.00k £28.00k £30.00k £43.00k £45.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £22.00k £50.00k £12.00k £16.00k £77.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0