THE RELATIONSHIPS FOUNDATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
For full details of our activities in the year to 31st. August 2012, please refer to our annual report.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 27 October 2004: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||||||||||||||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jeremy Lefroy | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Eleanor Lucy McCrone | Trustee | 06 April 2020 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Sarah Anne Dingley | Trustee | 06 June 2019 |
|
|
||||||||||||||||||||||||||
Philippa Taylor | Trustee | 06 November 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £382.11k | £270.22k | £254.89k | £135.03k | £88.31k | |
|
Total expenditure | £238.05k | £361.97k | £303.90k | £203.83k | £193.14k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 30 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 24 September 2024 | 86 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 July 2023 | 3 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 03 July 2023 | 3 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 29 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 20 July 2020 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 20 July 2020 | 20 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 JULY 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 OCTOBER 2004.
Charitable objects
1. TO CARRY OUT APPLIED RESEARCH INTO THEOLOGICAL AND ETHICAL PRINCIPLES AND ECONOMIC AND SOCIAL ISSUES CONCERNING THE ORGANISATION AND CONDUCT OF HUMAN RELATIONSHIPS IN PERSONAL AND PUBLIC LIFE BY:- 1.1 CARRYING OUT AND/OR COMMISSIONING RESEARCH PROJECTS; AND 1.2 EVALUATING THE RESULTS OF RESEARCH PROJECTS AND APPLYING THE SAME FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY, BY SPONSORING PUBLIC INITIATIVES. 2. TO PROVIDE EDUCATION AND TRAINING TO THE GENERAL PUBLIC IN THE PROMOTION AND ENCOURAGEMENT OF IMPROVED ORGANISATIONAL AND PERSONAL RELATIONSHIPS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
FUTURE BUSINESS CENTRE
KINGS HEDGES ROAD
CAMBRIDGE
CB4 2HY
- Phone:
- 01223 909408
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window