HOME FURNITURE SERVICES TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recycling and re-use of furniture and electrical items in Taunton area. Free collection for resale at low prices to people on benefits and low income. Many of our customers are being resettled from temporary accommodation to new housing by local authority and/or supported by social services and local charities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
Governance
- 23 September 2004: Standard registration
- FURNITRUST (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Mr Nicholas Stanley James ACHESON | Chair | 10 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Forrester Bell | Trustee | 16 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anthony Joseph Daniel Harding | Trustee | 08 August 2024 |
|
|
||||
JULIA TRIGG | Trustee | 05 July 2023 |
|
|||||
Martyn Charles Goodman | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
||||
Graham Hobrough | Trustee | 14 October 2016 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £125.84k | £142.78k | £164.10k | £191.76k | £209.94k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.06k | £110.19k | £164.23k | £174.63k | £196.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £36.36k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 November 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 16 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 05 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS BY PROVIDING PRACTICAL FURNITURE AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD EQUIPMENT AT AFFORDABLE PRICES FOR PERSONS OF LIMITED MEANS RESIDENT WITHIN TAUNTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Area of benefit
TAUNTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Home Furniture Service Trust
37-39 Bridge Street
TAUNTON
Somerset
TA1 1TP
- Phone:
- 01823253053
- Email:
- info@furnitrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window