Accounts and annual returns THE BROOKSIDE GARDEN TRUST

Charity Number: 1106250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 07 July 2024 19 May 2025 12 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 July 2024 Not Required
Annual return 07 July 2023 19 May 2025 377 days late
Accounts and TAR 07 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 07 July 2022 23 April 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 07 July 2021 04 May 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 07 July 2020 07 February 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 07 July 2020 Not Required