Financial history THE BROOKSIDE GARDEN TRUST

Charity Number: 1106250
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 07/07/2020 07/07/2021 07/07/2022 07/07/2023 07/07/2024
Total gross income £277 £318 £369 £349 £217
Total expenditure £160 £316 £252 £233 £528
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A