THE LORD BAMFORD FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1106004
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Promoting or developing the science of mechanical engineering, in all its forms and in particular, research, for the benefit of the public, and promoting such other charitible purposes as the trustees see fit.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £338,717
Total expenditure: £181,837

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

Main way of carrying out purposes is grant making
What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 23 September 2004: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • JCB FOUNDATION (Previous name)
  • THE SIR ANTHONY BAMFORD FOUNDATION (Previous name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
MR S OVENS Chair
JOSEPH CYRIL BAMFORD FOUNDATION
Received: On time
J C BAMFORD FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE LORD BAMFORD DL Trustee
ST PETER'S CHURCH DAYLESFORD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
J C BAMFORD FOUNDATION
Received: On time
JOSEPH CYRIL BAMFORD FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE BAMFORD CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
LADY BAMFORD Trustee
THE BAMFORD CHARITABLE FOUNDATION
Received: On time
THE DAYLESFORD FOUNDATION
Received: On time

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £326.32k £312.75k £315.27k £329.17k £338.72k
Total expenditure £244.04k £26.23k £43.81k £112.18k £181.84k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 31 January 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 15 February 2023 15 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 15 February 2023 15 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 27 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 26 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
J C BAMFORD EXCAVATORS LTD
LAKESIDE WORKS
DENSTONE ROAD
ROCESTER
UTTOXETER
ST14 5JP
Phone:
01889590312
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available