Filton Avenue Primary School Enrichment Fund

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To advance the education of pupils attending Filton Avenue Junior School, in particular to offer financial support to those pupils whose own family circumstances prevent them from accessing the full range of extra-curricula school activities that are available and in such other charitable ways as determined by the Trustees
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Bristol City
Governance
- 20 January 2005: Standard registration
- FFAJS (Previous name)
- THE FRIENDS OF FILTON AVENUE JUNIOR SCHOOL (Previous name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Jane Walton | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|||||
Antoniya Abios | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anne Rutherford | Trustee | 02 March 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £40 | £34 | £8 | £8 | £9 | |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 July 2024 | 1 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 03 September 2023 | 65 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 08 March 2022 | 251 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 March 2022 | 616 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 21 SEPTEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 20 DECEMBER 2004. as amended on 25 Apr 2022 as amended on 25 Apr 2022
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PUPILS ATTENDING FILTON AVENUE JUNIOR SCHOOL, IN PARTICULAR TO OFFER FINANCIAL SUPPORT TO THOSE PUPILS WHOSE OWN FAMILY CIRCUMSTANCES PREVENT THEM FROM ACCESSING THE FULL RANGE OF EXTRA-CURRICULA SCHOOL ACTIVITIES THAT ARE AVAILABLE AND IN SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE WAYS AS DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES.
Area of benefit
FILTON AVENUE JUNIOR SCHOOL, BRISTOL
Contact information
- Address:
-
Filton Avenue Primary School
Lockleaze Road
BRISTOL
BS7 9RP
- Phone:
- 01179030302
- Email:
- info@filtonavenue.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window