NEWHAM COMMUNITY RECYCLING LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Recycling and re-use to alleviate environmental landfill and ease poverty of those in need by passing on and re-using donated items.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2023
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Essex
- Norfolk
- Throughout London
Governance
- 28 November 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
GRAHAM PILKINGTON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Sarah Balaam | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Bryan Collier | Trustee | 01 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
JAGDISH SOLANKI | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN FRANK COUZENS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
STEPHEN BILL SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SAMUEL SURENDRAN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.90k | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 10 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 25 February 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 12 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 24 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 SEPTEMBER 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 21 OCTOBER 2005.
Charitable objects
(1) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF THE ENVIRONMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, PARTICULARLY THROUGH THE PROMOTION OF WASTE REDUCTION, RE-USE RECLAMATION, RECYCLING, USE OF RECYCLED PRODUCTS AND THE USE OF SURPLUS AND BY ADVANCING EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC ABOUT ALL ASPECT OF WASTE GENERATION, WASTE MANAGEMENT AND WASTE RECYCLING (2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP BY THE RECYCLING AND PROVISION OF FURNITURE, CLOTHES AND OTHER HOUSEHOLD ITEMS.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE LONDON, ESSEX AND NORFOLK.
Contact information
- Address:
-
33 Liverpool Road
LONDON
Canning Town
Newham
E16 4LU
- Phone:
- 07947549284
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window