GISBOROUGH PRIORY PROJECT LIMITED

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Restore, revitalise and rejuvenate the historic Gisborough Priory Woodland Gardens with local volunteers. Work with English Heritage to open Gisborough Priory to the public and allow access to the adjacent gardens. Collect and disseminate information on the gardens and priory. Hold events on and off site to raise funds and promote the site.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £300 from 1 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
63 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Redcar And Cleveland
Governance
- 03 May 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE CLARKE | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Susan Joan Marlborough | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
JENNIFER THOMAS | Trustee | 14 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Janice Coward | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Stephen Jonathan Jones | Trustee | 08 March 2021 |
|
|||||
CAROL ROBINSON | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Elizabeth Berry | Trustee | 05 August 2019 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.88k | £14.35k | £14.35k | £13.24k | £14.16k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.46k | £7.21k | £7.77k | £15.94k | £15.38k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.00k | £10.00k | £300 | £1.30k | £300 |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 08 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 22 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 3 MARCH 2003 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 31 MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC BY THE PRESERVATION, MAINTENANCE, REPAIR, OR RESTORATION OF GISBOROUGH PRIORY AND THE ASSOCIATED GARDEN AND TO PROVIDE OR ASSIST IN THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE INHABITANTS OF GUISBOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Area of benefit
GUISBOROUGH AND THE SURROUNDING AREA.
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Langdale
Guisborough
TS14 8EZ
- Phone:
- 01287 280535
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window