JOSEF HERMAN ART FOUNDATION CYMRU TRUST LIMITED

Charity number: 1110064
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The provision of art education by the promotion and appreciation of the work and life of Josef Herman, the stimulation of contemporary arts through planned activities within the community, developing the skills of young people in contemporary art by the award of grants and an annual art prize. Also the promotion of Human Rights, for example holding events to commemorate Holocaust Memorial Day.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £49,800
Total expenditure: £40,555

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 16 June 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

13 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rosalie Clement Hennion Trustee 12 February 2025
THE CONTEMPORARY ART SOCIETY FOR WALES (CYMDEITHAS GELFYDDYD GYFOES CYMRU)
Received: On time
Dr Sarah Louise Pace Trustee 12 February 2025
CYNGOR CELFYDDYDAU CYMRU
Received: On time
Rhian Jones Trustee 10 January 2024
None on record
Ian Griffith Turner Trustee 06 September 2023
None on record
Fay Miles-Board Trustee 08 March 2022
None on record
Annette Williams Trustee 01 May 2020
None on record
Gwenllian Mair Beynon Trustee 17 January 2019
None on record
Peter Sean Bryan Trustee 17 January 2019
None on record
Elizabeth Mary Pearce Trustee 15 September 2017
None on record
JACKIE HANKINS Trustee 01 January 2017
None on record
ELINOR MIRIAM GILBEY Trustee 03 August 2011
THE VRONHAUL (LLANDINAM) CHARITY
Received: On time
MARGARET DAVIES CHARITY
Received: On time
BETTY RACHEL WATKINS Trustee
THE YSTRADGYNLAIS MINERS WELFARE AND COMMUNITY HALL TRUST LIMITED
Received: On time
CAROLE MORGAN HOPKIN Trustee
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/05/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £11.76k £16.93k £8.93k £16.68k £49.80k
Total expenditure £6.39k £10.16k £17.00k £14.41k £40.56k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 20 December 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 10 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 May 2020 28 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 May 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Ystradgynlais Miners Welfare &
Community Hall
Brecon Road
Ystradgynlais
SWANSEA
SA9 1JJ
Phone:
01639 843163
Website:

josefhermanfoundation.org