THE VOLUNTEER CENTRE- CHESTERFIELD AND NORTH EAST DERBYSHIRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provides a brokerage service for volunteers in Chesterfield and North East Derbyshire helping them to access volunteering opportunities with other organisations or on the VC's own volunteering projects. The Volunteer Centre follows the six core functions of a Volunteer Centre as laid out by Volunteering England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £35,000 from 4 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
120 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Derbyshire
Governance
- 03 February 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Kate Sarvent | Chair | 22 January 2016 |
|
|
||||
Keith Falconer | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|||||
Paul Grinbergs | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Georgina Kassim | Trustee | 22 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Lynn Tory | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Elizabeth Marsden BEM | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Eric Gilson | Trustee | 02 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Diana Ruff | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Sharon Edith Rogers | Trustee | 10 February 2017 |
|
|
||||
Stephanie Jane Bratt | Trustee | 18 December 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £142.74k | £170.97k | £146.82k | £134.60k | £162.71k | |
|
Total expenditure | £117.80k | £117.80k | £128.76k | £130.17k | £135.11k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £57.00k | £159.46k | £117.45k | £93.15k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £16.00k | £2.30k | £28.47k | N/A | £35.00k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 13 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 11 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 03 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 152 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 July 2021 | 152 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 JANUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE BENEFIT OF ALL INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF CHESTERFIELD AND NORTH EAST DERBYSHIRE (THE 'AREA OF BENEFIT') BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER VOLUNTEERS AND ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION, PROTECT HEALTH, RELIEVE POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS AND PROMOTE ANY OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND IN FURTHERANCE OF THESE OBJECTS BUT NOT OTHERWISE THE COMPANY SHALL: A) ADVISE AND SUPPORT PERSONS WILLING TO VOLUNTEER; B) PROMOTE VOLUNTEERING AND COMMUNITY INVOLVEMENT AND PROVIDE A CENTRE; C) ADVISE AND SUPPORT ORGANISATIONS WHICH INVOLVE AND ARE WILLING TO INVOLVE VOLUNTEERS IN THEIR CHARITABLE ACTIVITIES.
Area of benefit
DERBYSHIRE
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Volunteer Centre
38 Knifesmithgate
CHESTERFIELD
S40 1RQ
- Phone:
- 01246276777
- Email:
- info@chesterfieldvc.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window