POWERHOUSE FOR WOMEN

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Powerhouse is an organization of women with learning difficulties and is run by members. We facilitate group activities on the premises. We also go out in to the community. Our group activities are designed to empower members around health, advocacy, personal safety, employment and skills to improve quality of life and general confidence.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
8 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Newham
Governance
- 09 February 2005: Standard registration
- POWERHOUSE (Working name)
- Care Inspectorate Wales (CIW)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Sarah Ruiz | Trustee | 01 July 2016 |
|
|||||||
MONIKA PINDEL | Trustee | 01 September 2014 |
|
|
||||||
ELIZABETH DUHIG | Trustee | 19 February 2014 |
|
|
||||||
SOPHIA SIMOS | Trustee | 15 April 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £18.99k | £23.94k | £17.64k | £4.86k | £45.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £20.53k | £12.64k | £21.56k | £21.13k | £21.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £5.70k | £4.94k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 10 April 2025 | 69 days late | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
10 April 2025 | 69 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 02 June 2024 | 123 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 28 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 AUGUST 2004
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AN THE RELIEF OF MENTAL AND PHYSICAL DISTRESS AMONG WOMEN WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES WHO HAVE BEEN PHYSICALLY, SEXUAL OR EMOTIONALLY ABUSED BY WORKING WITH HOUSING AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS TO RAISE AWARENESS OF ISSUES OF ABUSE AND VIOLENCE TO WOMEN WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND TO EMPOWER WOMEN WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES THROUGHOUT THEIR INVOLVEMENT WITH THE ORGANISATION AND THROUGH TRAINING AND ADVOCACY AND BY SUCH OTHER MEANS AS SHALL FURTHER THE SAID OBJECTIVES.
Area of benefit
GREATER LONDON
Contact information
- Address:
-
34A WINDSOR ROAD
LONDON
E7 0QX
- Phone:
- 07961106096
- Email:
- info@thepowerhouse.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window