SAMBURU TRUST UK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The charity exists for the relief of poverty, hardship and distress, the advancement of education, wildlife conservation, and the protection and promotion of good health among the inhabitants of Kenya, in particular among the Samburu community of the Kirimun/ North Laikipia area.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
10 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Cardiff
- Cheshire West & Chester
- Shropshire
- Kenya
Governance
- 11 May 2005: Standard registration
- OL MALO (UK) (Working name)
- OL MALO CHARITABLE TRUST (UK) (Previous name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ALUN THOMAS NEWBY | Trustee | 13 April 2011 |
|
|
||||
EMILY JANE BELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
DANIEL SIMEON MORRIS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £19.73k | £16.77k | £24.75k | £14.48k | £29.20k | |
|
Total expenditure | £22.29k | £22.34k | £22.45k | £6.20k | £320 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 December 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 21 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 05 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 27 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 06/10/2004 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 15/04/2005 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 31/08/2006 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 20/07/2009 AS AMENDED ON 11/02/2013
Charitable objects
THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION AND THE PROTECTION AND PROMOTION OF GOOD HEALTH AMONG THE INHABITANTS OF KENYA, IN PARTICULAR AMONG THE SAMBURU COMMUNITY OF THE KIRIMUN / NORTH LAIKIPIA AREA, BY SUCH EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
KENYA, KIRIMUN / NORTH LAIKIPIA AREA,
Contact information
- Address:
-
103a High Street
Tarporley
CW6 0AB
- Phone:
- 07866385315
- Email:
- alun.newby@outlook.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window