Financial history ASHA TRUST (SRI LANKA)

Charity Number: 1108536
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £18.69k £40.18k £26.20k £23.41k £15.96k
Total expenditure £31.63k £43.07k £23.65k £24.88k £11.07k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A