THE FRIENDS OF THE RSPCA SOUTH GODSTONE ANIMAL CENTRE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The objective of the Charity is to further the charitable work of the RSPCA South Godstone Animal Centre by making grants or providing other assistance. The Charity raises funds to provide financial support to the Animal Centre, principally through fundraising events and charitable donations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2020
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Animals
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Other Charitable Activities
- Surrey
Governance
- 05 July 2005: Standard registration
- 20 December 2021: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- 20 December 2021: Funds transferred to 219099 ROYAL SOCIETY FOR THE PREVENTION OF CRUELTY TO ANI...
- FRIENDS (Working name)
- Investment
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2016 | 31/12/2017 | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £123.99k | £148.90k | £110.38k | £34.22k | £31.06k | |
|
Total expenditure | £74.86k | £77.69k | £82.11k | £57.00k | £474.86k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 23 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 17 December 2021 | 47 days late | |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | COVID filing extension granted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | COVID filing extension granted | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2018 | 31 October 2019 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 December 2017 | 25 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2017 | 25 October 2018 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 OCTOBER 2004 AS AMENDED 6 APRIL 2005.
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE FRIENDS GROUP IS TO FURTHER THE CHARITABLE WORK OF THE ANIMAL ESTABLISHMENT BY MAKING GRANTS OR PROVIDING SUCH OTHER ASSISTANCE TO THE ANIMAL ESTABLISHMENT AS THE EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE DECIDES, AFTER PRIOR CONSULTATION WITH THE ANIMAL ESTABLISHMENT ("THE OBJECTS").
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE SOUTH GODSTONE, SURREY.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window