THE INSPIRE ARTS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
BALPA (Bristol Academy of Live Performing Arts) for ages 2 - 18 year olds in singing, dancing, musical theatre and instruments. We run a bursary scheme for this to ensure it is accessible to all community members within this age range. Community activities such as involvement in the carnival and Christmas lights switch on. We are now running adult classes as well.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £3,960 from 2 government grant(s)
People

4 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England
Governance
- 24 October 2005: Standard registration
- INSPIRE (Working name)
- THE INSPIRE TRUST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Peter john Davies | Trustee | 23 January 2025 |
|
|
||||||||
Sean Cavanagh | Trustee | 17 December 2014 |
|
|
||||||||
WILLIAM DOUGLAS BROWNING MCGINN | Trustee | 17 March 2011 |
|
|
||||||||
Richard David COLLIER-KEYWOOD | Trustee |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £50.58k | £39.26k | £45.52k | £38.02k | £75.48k | |
|
Total expenditure | £39.97k | £39.91k | £40.17k | £50.37k | £64.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £9.40k | £1.25k | £3.96k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 01 May 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 27 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 21 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 15 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 25 June 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 11 AUGUST 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 26 AUGUST 2005 AND 15 SEPTEMBER 2005.
Charitable objects
(1) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF PEOPLE, IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE, IN THE ARTS (INCLUDING IN PARTICULAR MUSIC, DRAMA AND DANCE). (2) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, EITHER GENERALLY OR INDIVIDUALLY, OF PEOPLE LIVING IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR ELSEWHERE BY: (A) PROVIDING SUCH PERSONS WITH GOODS AND/OR SERVICES WHICH THEY COULD NOT OTHERWISE AFFORD THROUGH LACK OF MEANS; AND (B) MAKING GRANTS OF MONEY FOR PROVIDING OR PAYING FOR ITEMS, SERVICES OR FACILITIES..
Area of benefit
THE UNITED KINGDOM AND ELSEWHERE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE INSPIRE ARTS TRUST
CAEDMON COMPLEX
BRISTOL ROAD
THORNBURY
BRISTOL
BS35 3JA
- Phone:
- 01454 414880
- Email:
- info@inspiretrust.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window