THE FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS C.E. PRIMARY SCHOOL, HORSHAM

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
childrens welfare and education
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- West Sussex
Governance
- 04 March 2005: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Suzannah Threlfall | Chair | 20 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Samantha Rowlands | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Julie Becker | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sam McGeown | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Alyce Andrews | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Sharon King | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | 31/08/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.38k | £2.29k | £1.81k | £2.42k | £1.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £23.80k | £0 | £2.37k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2024 | 11 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 11 October 2024 | 103 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 July 2023 | 20 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 08 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 06 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 23 NOVEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES CONNECTED WITH THE SCHOOL AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION SELECT AND IN SUCH SHARES AND SUCH A MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ALL SAINTS C OF E PRIMARY SCHOOL
TYLDEN WAY
HORSHAM
RH12 5JB
- Phone:
- 01403270460
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window