THE BEXHILL CARING COMMUNITY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote within the former borough of Bexhill, East Sussex, the welfare of the disabled, aged and lonely in any manner which is now or hereafter may be deemed by law to be charitable.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
43 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- East Sussex
Governance
- 25 February 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTOPHER JOHN ASHFORD | Chair | 29 July 2014 |
|
|||||||
Katherine Mary Harmer | Trustee | 21 December 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Susan Helen Klein | Trustee | 18 July 2019 |
|
|
||||||
DOROTHY MAY SMITH | Trustee |
|
||||||||
PATRICK NEVILLE DONALDSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £569.76k | £154.00k | £205.90k | £124.89k | £130.52k | |
|
Total expenditure | £190.76k | £176.32k | £172.40k | £199.58k | £229.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £908 | £20.63k | £9.73k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £507.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £46.18k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | £11.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | £4.39k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | £434.05k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £190.76k | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 24 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 13 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 25 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 14 DECEMBER 2004.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE WITHIN THE FORMER BOROUGH OF BEXHILL, EAST SUSSEX, THE WELFARE OF THOSE IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR, BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY ELDERLY PERSONS IN ANY MANNER DEEMED BY LAW TO BE CHARITABLE.
Area of benefit
THE FORMER BOROUGH OF BEXHILL, EAST SUSSEX.
Contact information
- Address:
-
17 Western Road
Bexhill-on-Sea
East Sussex
TN40 1DU
- Phone:
- 01424215116
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window