THE ROYAL AIR FORCE CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Club is established to carry out the charitable objects of the Company on its behalf in promoting the efficiency of the Royal Air Force by improving the condition of officers holding commissions therein and in other associated Services and by preserving and fostering among them the esprit de corps and traditions of those Services by every suitable means.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income:
£11,566,632
Donations and legacies | £187.16k | |
Charitable activities | £11.15m | |
Other trading activities | £231.91k | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£10,390,938
Raising funds | £29.92k | |
Charitable activities | £10.23m | |
Other | £135.13k |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £165.05k | |
Charitable expenditure | £10.23m | |
Retained for future use | £1.18m |
People

125 Employee(s)
15 Trustee(s)
46 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£80k to £90k | 2 |
£90k to £100k | 1 |
£100k to £110k | 1 |
£150k to £200k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Armed Forces/emergency Service Efficiency
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- City Of Westminster
Governance
- 24 February 2005: Standard registration
- 07 August 2017: Funds received from 1061987 THE R.A.F.C COMPANY LIMITED
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
15 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Paul Murray | Chair | 13 October 2021 |
|
|
||||
Gavin James Poole | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
BERNARD ANTHONY WATSON | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|||||
Peter Charles Brown | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Amanda Jane Scarth | Trustee | 27 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Phillip James Wadlow | Trustee | 10 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Higgins | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Neeraj Kapur | Trustee | 13 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Wardrope | Trustee | 27 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Wing Commander Paula Simone Willmot | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Group Captain James Roger Beldon | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Flight Lieutenant Haig Anthony John Tyler | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Group Captain Alan John Lockwood | Trustee | 20 March 2019 |
|
|
||||
Air Commodore Dai Whittingham | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sqn Ldr John Peters | Trustee | 11 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £9.55m | £6.05m | £7.15m | £10.18m | £11.57m | |
|
Total expenditure | £9.39m | £6.72m | £6.24m | £9.13m | £10.39m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £476.84k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £19.44k | £401.10k | £925.09k | £175.71k | £187.16k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £48.82k | £58.39k | £145.19k | £231.91k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £9.53m | £4.26m | £6.17m | £9.86m | £11.15m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | £0 | £1.74m | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | £15.20k | £500 | £57.33k | £7.20k | £1.92k | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £9.20m | £6.70m | £6.21m | £8.97m | £10.23m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £28.13k | £15.57k | £43.13k | £29.92k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £34.48k | £38.99k | £37.64k | £104.92k | £109.80k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £186.31k | £0 | £22.74k | £112.95k | £135.13k |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £12.70m | £12.22m | £11.33m | £10.56m | £10.49m | |
|
Long-term investments | £100 | £100 | £100 | £100 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.59m | £1.82m | £3.50m | £3.82m | £4.98m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £6.72m | £7.27m | £7.04m | £5.37m | £5.38m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 03 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 07 July 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 13 January 2023 | 74 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 13 January 2023 | 74 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 14 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 16 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 24 DECEMBER 2004 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 28 JUL 2017 as amended on 16 May 2024
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE EFFICIENCY OF THE ROYAL AIR FORCE BY IMPROVING THE CONDITION OF OFFICERS HOLDING COMMISSIONS THEREIN AND IN OTHER ASSOCIATED SERVICES AND BY PRESERVING AND FOSTERING AMONG THEM THE ESPIRIT DE CORPS AND TRADITIONS OF THOSE SERVICES BY EVERY SUITABLE MEANS AND IN PARTICULAR IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS: BY ESTABLISHING MAINTAINING AND CONDUCTING IN LONDON A CENTRAL RESIDENTIAL AND NON-RESIDENTIAL CLUB FOR THE USE AND ACCOMMODATION OF MEMBERS, AND BY MAKING AVAILABLE TO THEM SUCH OTHER SERVICES, RECREATIONAL FACILITIES AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITIES AS MAY BE DESIRABLE AT PRICES WHICH, SO FAR AS POSSIBLE, CAN BE AFFORDED BY ALL MEMBERS OF WHATEVER RANK BY ENCOURAGING BY MEANS OF DISCUSSIONS, LECTURES, FILM SHOWS, VISITS TO PLACES OF INTEREST AND BY OTHER MEANS, AN INTEREST IN ALL MATTERS CONNECTED WITH FLYING IN GENERAL AND WITH ROYAL AIR FORCE IN PARTICULAR BY ENCOURAGING AND ORGANISING THE HOLDING AT THE CLUB OF SERVICE REUNIONS, MEETINGS AND SIMILAR FUNCTIONS AND BY PLACING AT THE SERVICE OF HER MAJESTY'S GOVERNMENT FACILITIES AT THE CLUB FOR THE ENTERTAINMENT OF REPRESENTATIVES OF FOREIGN AIR FORCES BY ENCOURAGING AND BY PROVIDING FACILITIES TO ENABLE OFFICERS SERVING IN THE ROYAL AIR FORCE AND IN OTHER ASSOCIATED SERVICES TO MEET AND ASSOCIATE REGULARLY WITH EACH OTHER, AND WITH PERSONS WHO HAVE PREVIOUSLY SERVED AS OFFICERS IN SUCH SERVICES AND WITH MEMBERS OF OTHER AIR FORCES AND TO BENEFIT FROM THE KNOWLEDGE AND EXPERIENCE OF SUCH PERSONS
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
ROYAL AIR FORCE CLUB
128 PICCADILLY
LONDON
W1J 7PY
- Phone:
- 02073991000
- Email:
- GeneralOffice@rafclub.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window