Accounts and annual returns INSPIRATIONS

Charity Number: 1109974
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2025 23 May 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2025 Not Required
Annual return 29 February 2024 25 March 2025 86 days late
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2024 25 March 2025 86 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 28 February 2023 13 March 2025 441 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2023

(These accounts
have been qualified)

13 March 2025 441 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2021 28 October 2022 28 days late
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2021 28 October 2022 28 days late Download Open in new window
Annual return 30 November 2020 23 September 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 30 November 2020 23 September 2021 On Time Download Open in new window