Financial history INSPIRATIONS

Charity Number: 1109974
Regulatory alert
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/11/2020 30/11/2021 28/02/2023 29/02/2024 28/02/2025
Total gross income £1.67m £1.85m £2.88m £895.00k £0
Total expenditure £1.74m £1.86m £2.87m £885.00k £0
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £1.67m £1.85m £2.88m £895.00k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.74m £1.85m £2.86m £885.00k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £6.50k £6.50k £7.73k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Governance £6.50k £6.00k £15.56k £0 N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £205.33k £648.47k £774.18k £335.00k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A