SOUTHREPPS COMMONS TRUST
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
On behalf of Southrepps Parish Council and Norfolk County Council we look after all of Southrepps Common which is 12.4 hectares of Local Nature Reserve, including a Site of Special Scientific Interest whose management is prescribed by Natural England.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2018
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Norfolk
Governance
- 04 April 2005: Standard registration
- 27 July 2019: Removed (Funds transferred (gi))
- 27 July 2019: Funds transferred to 208734 NORFOLK WILDLIFE TRUST
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2014 | 30/04/2015 | 30/04/2016 | 30/04/2017 | 30/04/2018 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.61k | £1.83k | £2.70k | £2.14k | £1.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.15k | £2.49k | £2.98k | £4.24k | £1.69k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2018 | 16 October 2018 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2018 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2017 | 14 October 2017 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2017 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2016 | 04 April 2017 | 35 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2016 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 7 FEBRUARY 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC, THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT WITHIN SOUTHREPPS COMMON AND TO CO-ORDINATED ALL PRACTICAL ACTIVITY IN RELATION THERETO. TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE CONSERVATION, PROTECTION AND IMPROVEMENT OF THE PHYSICAL AND NATURAL ENVIRONMENT WITHIN SOUTHREPPS COMMON.
Area of benefit
SOUTHREPPS COMMON, NORFOLK
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window