HYWEL DDA UNIVERSITY HEALTH BOARD CARDIAC REHABILITATION FUNDRAISING GROUP (CARMARTHENSHIRE DIVISION)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Charity aims to raise funds to achieve our stated objectives. Funds are raised by; Raffles, Car-Boot Sales, Monies in lieu of flowers on the demise of supporters and benefactors of the health system we support.Quiz nights. Various other similar activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Carmarthenshire
- Ceredigion
- Pembrokeshire
Governance
- 21 June 2005: Standard registration
- CALON+ (Working name)
- GLANGWILI CARDIAC REHABILITATION BUILDING FUND AND SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
- GLANGWILI CARDIAC REHABILITATION SUPPORT GROUP (Previous name)
- HYWEL DDA UNIVERSITY HEALYH BOARD CARDIAC REHABILITATION FUNDRAISING GROUP (CARMARTHENSHIRE DIVISION) (Previous name)
- HYWEL DDA UNIVERSITYHEALYH BOARD CARDIAC REHABILITATION FUNDRAISING GROUP (CARMARTHENSHIRE DIVISION) (Previous name)
- Welsh Government (Social Landlords And Housing Associations)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Brian David John Harman | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
IAN WILLIAMS | Trustee | 12 October 2016 |
|
|||||
HELEN LLEWELLYN-GRIFFITHS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SANDRA MARY PHILLIPS | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £6.23k | £2.98k | £5.67k | £0 | £1.70k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.23k | £2.60k | £1.93k | £4.38k | £3.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 02 November 2023 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 17 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 17 March 2022 | 137 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 04 February 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 08/01/2005 AS AMENDED ON 14/06/2005 AS AMENDED ON 06/02/2012 AS AMENDED ON 02/06/2014
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS AND PRESERVE THE HEALTH OF PERSONS AT RISK OF OR SUFFERING FROM CARDIAC PROBLEMS IN PARTICULAR ( BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) BY THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES AND EQUIPMENT NOT NORMALLY PROVIDED FROM STATUTORY FUNDS FOR CARE AND TREATMENT OF SUCH PERSONS INCLUDING BY: 1. THE FUNDING OF A CARDIAC REHABILITATION CENTRE. 2. THE FUNDING OF EQUIPMENT USED TO AID REHABILITATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED BUT IN PRACTICE CARMARTHENSHIRE, EAST PEMBROKESHIRE AND SOUTH CEREDIGION
Contact information
- Address:
-
Trawsmawr Newydd
Cwmoernant
CARMARTHEN
SA31 1EG
- Phone:
- 01267227958
- Email:
- sandyphips@hotmail.co.uk
- Website:
-
calonplus.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window