THE WELLINGTON TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The conservation and preservation of the former Royal Navy sloop HMS WELLINGTON as part of the nation's maritime heritage, the education of the public in the history of the British and Commonwealth Merchant Services and, the importance of seaborne trade to our island nation. An educational programme is in place for KS 1 & 2 children, a Secondary School Programme and a Sixth Form STEM Programme.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

10 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout London
- Scotland
Governance
- 15 April 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Timothy Paul Loughton | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|||||||
Andrew David Lambert | Trustee | 06 February 2025 |
|
|
||||||
Captain John Rees OBE | Trustee | 17 July 2024 |
|
|||||||
Professor Dominic Tweddle | Trustee | 17 January 2024 |
|
|||||||
Sheena Rosemary Thomson | Trustee | 08 September 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Louisa Jane Burton | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Richard Thomas Congreve Murray | Trustee | 09 July 2023 |
|
|
||||||
Nicholas Drew Dowden | Trustee | 31 May 2022 |
|
|
||||||
Munsur ALI | Trustee | 22 July 2020 |
|
|
||||||
JENNIFER MARY MOSELEY | Trustee | 11 December 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £392.83k | £557.76k | £139.86k | £68.78k | £138.07k | |
|
Total expenditure | £505.18k | £373.90k | £256.31k | £189.74k | £251.99k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £234.16k | £13.58k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £496.67k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £56.19k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £45 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £4.85k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £20.01k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £367.09k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £6.80k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £5.40k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £72 | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 25 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 24 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 30 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 26 JANUARY 2005 as amended on 17 Jan 2024
Charitable objects
1. THE RESTORATION MAINTENANCE AND PRESERVATION FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF THE SLOOP HQS WELLINGTON AS PART OF THE NATION'S HERITAGE. 2. THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN THE HISTORY AND TRADITIONS OF THE BRITISH MERCHANT NAVY AND THE ROYAL NAVY.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Contact information
- Address:
-
HQS Wellington
Temple Stairs
Victoria Embankment
Westminster
LONDON
WC2R 2PN
- Phone:
- 03301 322844
- Email:
- info@thewellingtontrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window