ST JOHN'S GUILD

Charity number: 1109399
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The aims of the Guild are to meet the spiritual, physical and sensory needs of people who are blind, deaf/blind or visually impaired and physically disabled people by focussing on the following areas: supporting the Guild Branches, promoting retreats, pilgrimages and holidays of varied interests and developing services where appropriate.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023

Total income: £150,128
Total expenditure: £117,015

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
  • Disability
  • The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Individuals
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 06 December 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

5 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Rev Brian Regan Chair 22 November 2018
None on record
Rosalind McCarthy Trustee 03 October 2024
None on record
Nigel Draper-Cook Trustee 03 October 2024
None on record
Barbara Cork Trustee 26 September 2019
None on record
John Grosvenor Trustee 27 November 2013
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £123.50k £132.84k £134.42k £133.65k £150.13k
Total expenditure £111.69k £97.49k £90.11k £73.46k £117.02k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 30 August 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 30 August 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 27 October 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 12 August 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 08 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 December 2019 18 December 2020 48 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 18 December 2020 48 days late Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
SCHEME OF THE 7 FEBRUARY 1958, 9 FEBRUARY 1982; AND 29 JULY 2005
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE NEEDS OF PERSONS WITH SENSORY IMPAIRMENT IN PARTICULAR I) LADIES WITH VISUAL IMPAIRMENT II) PERSONS WITH BOTH VISUAL AND HEARING IMPAIRMENT III) PERSONS WITH SENSORY IMPAIRMENT AND OTHER PHYSICAL DISABILITY AND IV) MEMBERS OF THE CHURCH OF ENGLAND WITH VISUAL IMPAIRMENT.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL
Registration history
  • 06 December 2005 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
St John's Guild
16 Commercial Street
Birmingham
B1 1RS
Phone:
01213825596