HOME-START SHEPWAY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Volunteer home visiting service offering emotional and practical support for parents with young children including - Building Bright Futures Project - Enhanced Domestic Abuse Project - Big Hopes Big Futures Project - Young Parent Service
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 16 May 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Nicola Deane | Chair | 07 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tina Leslie | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Tracey Perrow | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Gwendoline Finch | Trustee | 06 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
TINA BEAN | Trustee | 07 March 2024 |
|
|||||
Penny Marsh | Trustee | 27 July 2017 |
|
|
||||
MELAINE JANE TOMS-WILSON | Trustee | 04 December 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £247.22k | £255.59k | £238.13k | £250.84k | £249.00k | |
|
Total expenditure | £256.02k | £232.19k | £239.83k | £252.85k | £247.09k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £850 | £5.79k | £26.14k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 30 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 03 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 December 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 20 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 30 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 22 March 2021 | 50 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 AUGUST 2004.
Charitable objects
(A)TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN (B)TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN (C)TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN (D)TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILD CARE WITHIN THE AREA OF SHEPWAY AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
SHEPWAY AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Offices 1-4
4th Floor
Civic Centre
Castle Hill Avenue
Folkestone
Kent
- Phone:
- 01303244836
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window