PIERS SIMON APPEAL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Piers Simon Appeal runs School in a Bag (SIAB) - an initiative that distributes rucksacks filled with stationery, learning resources and eating utensils to poor, orphan, vulnerable and disaster affected children around the world. SIAB runs many events including Home Farm Fest, a 3 day music festival held at the charity HQ in Somerset The charity has 4 employees and 2 part time volunteers
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Other Charitable Activities
- Somerset
- Albania
- Angola
- Bahrain
- Bangladesh
- Belarus
- Bolivia
- Brazil
- Bulgaria
- Burma
- Cambodia
- Chile
- Ecuador
- Eswatini
- Fiji
- France
- Ghana
- Greece
- Haiti
- India
- Indonesia
- Ivory Coast
- Kenya
- Madagascar
- Malawi
- Morocco
- Nepal
- Nigeria
- Peru
- Philippines
- Romania
- Sierra Leone
- South Africa
- Sri Lanka
- Syria
- Tanzania
- Thailand
- The Gambia
- Uganda
- Zambia
- Zimbabwe
Governance
- 17 May 2005: Standard registration
- 18 April 2019: Funds received from 1099110 THE TRIBAL GROUP FOUNDATION
- PSA (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Caroline Jean Reeves | Trustee | 22 July 2019 |
|
|
||||
JULIA LOWE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CELIA SIMON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROGER HENRY SIMON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £290.88k | £53.80k | £2.12k | £541 | £589 | |
|
Total expenditure | £306.23k | £93.94k | £14.56k | £499 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £14.33k | £19.34k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 06 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 17 February 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 28 February 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 16 MAY 2005
Charitable objects
(A) THE RELIEF OF FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OF PEOPLE AND COMMUNITIES WHO ARE SUFFERING HARDSHIP AS A RESULT OF DROUGHT, EARTHQUAKE, FLOOD, WAR OR ANY OTHER DISASTER OR WHO BY REASON OF THEIR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CONDITIONS, ARE IN NEED OF ASSISTANCE, ANYWHERE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT LIMITATION TO THE FOREGOING) IN RELATION TO THOSE PERSONS AND COMMUNITIES IN THAILAND ADVERSELY AFFECTED BY THE EARTHQUAKE AND TSUNAMI DISASTER THAT OCCURRED ON 26TH DECEMBER 2004; (B) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, PARTICULARLY BY THE DEVELOPMENT OF EDUCATION, HEALTH AND OTHER SOCIAL SERVICES, THE IMPROVEMENT OF TRANSPORT INFRASTRUCTURE, WATER SUPPLIES, AND OTHER COMMUNAL FACILITIES, AND THE PROMOTION OF SELF-HELP ACTIVITIES AMONGST THOSE PEOPLE OR COMMUNITIES; AND (C) TO RELIEVE FINANCIAL HARDSHIP, DISTRESS AND SUFFERING IN ANY PART OF THE WORLD IN PARTICULAR BY THE PROVISION OF, OR ASSISTANCE IN THE PROVISION OF, HUMANITARIAN LONG TERM REHABILITATION AND RECOVERY PROGRAMMES.
Area of benefit
WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
HOME FARM
MAIN STREET
CHILTHORNE DOMER
YEOVIL
BA22 8RD
- Phone:
- 07721741623
- Email:
- luke.simon@schoolinabag.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window