Trustees RCC PILOTAGE FOUNDATION

Charity number: 1109561
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Roger Bickerstaff Trustee 10 April 2025
None on record
Dr George William Aylward Trustee 10 April 2025
None on record
Antony Edmond Wells Trustee 09 January 2025
THE PAROCHIAL CHURCH COUNCIL OF THE ECCLESIASTICAL PARISH OF THE WOODFORD VALLEY WITH ARCHERS GATE
Received: On time
belinda vernon Trustee 11 October 2024
NATIONAL LEARNING AND WORK INSTITUTE
Received: On time
Janet Howard Spinlove Trustee 21 May 2021
None on record
Paul Michael Alexander BRYANS Trustee 01 February 2018
None on record