Financial history SALTBURN DISTRICT UNIVERSITY OF THE THIRD AGE (U3A)

Charity number: 1109691
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £79.08k £10.62k £35.06k £72.83k £68.86k
Total expenditure £71.33k £8.01k £33.46k £68.64k £70.03k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A