HOME-START WOKINGHAM DISTRICT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Homestart offer support,friendship,and practical help for parents with young children,in the locality of Wokingham Borough.Families are supported through the provision of a volunteer, who would visit the family in their own home once a week for up to three hours.We provide additional support through family groups.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £24,725 from 1 government grant(s)
People

9 Trustee(s)
25 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Wokingham
Governance
- 24 May 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Gareth Heard | Chair | 23 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Jessica Ruth Margaret Searle | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Anne Laleman | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Paul Armitage | Trustee | 14 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Kevin McGill | Trustee | 13 May 2024 |
|
|
||||
Christopher Alan Jack | Trustee | 08 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Sheila Mary Heard | Trustee | 18 April 2017 |
|
|
||||
Helen Diffenthal | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
||||
Patricia Cannam | Trustee | 10 November 2014 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £103.42k | £168.72k | £119.15k | £119.30k | £107.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £129.61k | £133.95k | £148.62k | £122.21k | £43.79k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £24.00k | £24.29k | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | £12.36k | £24.72k | £24.73k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 20 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 22 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 19 January 2023 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 February 2022 | 15 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 February 2022 | 15 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 17 February 2021 | 17 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 21 MARCH 2005.
Charitable objects
3.1.1 TO SAFEGUARD, PROTECT AND PRESERVE THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL OF CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; 3.1.2 TO PREVENT CRUELTY TO OR MALTREATMENT OF CHILDREN; 3.1.3 TO RELIEVE SICKNESS, POVERTY AND NEED AMONGST CHILDREN AND PARENTS OF CHILDREN; 3.1.4 TO PROMOTE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC IN BETTER STANDARDS OF CHILDCARE WITHIN THE AREA OF WOKINGHAM UNITARY AUTHORITY AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Area of benefit
WOKINGHAM UNITARY AUTHORITY AND ITS ENVIRONS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Wade
40 Reading Road
WOKINGHAM
Berkshire
RG41 1EH
- Phone:
- 07742012962
- Email:
- admin@home-startwd.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window