Financial history THE GRESHAM'S FOUNDATION

Charity Number: 1109441
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £987.00k £475.00k £1.86m £758.00k £2.11m
Total expenditure £411.00k £500.00k £415.00k £387.00k £449.00k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £904.00k N/A £1.56m £511.00k £2.03m
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Charitable activities £0 N/A £0 £0 £0
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £111.00k £33.00k
Income - Investment £83.00k N/A £95.00k £62.00k £87.00k
Income - Other £0 N/A £198.00k £296.00k £0
Income - Legacies £3.50k N/A £4.31k £1.50k £1.18m
Expenditure - Charitable activities £384.00k N/A £377.00k £356.00k £430.00k
Expenditure - Raising funds £27.00k N/A £38.00k £31.00k £19.00k
Expenditure - Governance £5.00k N/A £0 £6.00k £7.00k
Expenditure - Grants institution £363.00k N/A £359.00k £341.00k £412.70k
Expenditure - Investment management £15.00k N/A £3.00k £2.00k £4.00k
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 £0