PAL CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1110416
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The charity achieved a high level of success in establishing additional learning partnerships. Many of the existing learning partnerships that had been created previously, benefitted from a variety of programmes and schemes that were promoted by the charity during the period, and which have contributed to their increased knowledge and appreciation of the Orthodox Jewish Faith.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £188,176
Total expenditure: £152,134

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Religious Activities
Who the charity helps:
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Services
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout England And Wales

Governance

Registration history:
  • 12 July 2005: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PAL (Working name)
  • PHONE AND LEARN (Working name)
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
DOV ZVI HARRIS Chair 20 February 2005
None on record
ANDREW WARREN LEVISON Trustee 20 February 2005
THE BSD CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF ATERES MOSHE
Received: On time
NORTH WEST LONDON COMMUNAL MIKVAH LIMITED
Received: On time
FRIENDS OF DR ADLER'S SURGERY
Received: On time
TORAH FAMILY SUPPORT NETWORK LTD
Received: On time
JONATHAN RABSON Trustee 20 February 2005
BAILA CHARITABLE TRUST
Received: On time
Michael Akiva Hackenbroch Trustee 20 February 2005
MESILA UK LIMITED
Received: On time
ACHISOMOCH AID COMPANY LIMITED
Received: On time
VESHINANTOM
Recently registered
JEHUDA LEVI WITTENBERG Trustee 20 February 2005
TORAS HAMISHPACHA LTD
Received: On time
CHASDEI YECHEZKEL C.I.O.
Recently registered
NORTH WEST LONDON CHEVRA KADISHA
Recently registered
DANIEL BINSTOCK Trustee 20 February 2005
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £98.87k £190.63k £50.08k £95.04k £188.18k
Total expenditure £101.47k £89.68k £106.20k £115.00k £152.13k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £3.47k £936 N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 14 January 2025 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 04 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 19 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 31 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
56 GOLDERS GARDENS
LONDON
NW11 9BU
Phone:
08000553276