MORECAMBE BAY ESTUARIES ADVANCED MOTORCYCLISTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To promote the improvement of the standard of riding and the advancement of road safety.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

12 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Amateur Sport
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Cumbria
- Lancashire
Governance
- 31 May 2005: Standard registration
- MBEAM (Working name)
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Antony James Hunter Barratt | Chair | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Steven Kenneth Ingle | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Roderick Stuart Lund | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Mark Julian Held | Trustee | 13 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Dr Ian Lawrence Shuttler | Trustee | 07 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
John Richard Unwin | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Paul Marsh | Trustee | 16 April 2023 |
|
|
||||
Richard Sharp | Trustee | 07 January 2021 |
|
|
||||
Mark Andrew Ellis | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Richard Andrew Ramsden | Trustee | 11 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
ROBERT BRYNE | Trustee | 14 October 2012 |
|
|
||||
Paul Morris Newton | Trustee | 14 October 2012 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £8.55k | £4.38k | £9.20k | £7.37k | £5.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £6.13k | £8.23k | £11.67k | £8.78k | £3.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 27 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 12 April 2024 | 72 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 22 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 21 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 17 APRIL 2005 as amended on 09 May 2022
Charitable objects
THE OBJECTS OF THE GROUP ARE FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT TO PROMOTE THE IMPROVEMENT OF THE STANDARD OF DRIVING AND THE ADVANCEMENT OF ROAD SAFETY.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
3 Douglas Street
Walney
BARROW-IN-FURNESS
Cumbria
LA14 3QQ
- Phone:
- 0844 586 7971
- Email:
- secretary@mbeam.org.uk
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window