Financial history Y CARE INTERNATIONAL

Charity number: 1109789
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2021 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £1.04m £167.88k £1.09m £823.11k £466.92k
Total expenditure £1.46m £330.44k £745.88k £982.24k £731.76k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £197.96k £47.07k £28.82k N/A N/A
Income - Donations and legacies £790.95k N/A £1.06m £806.39k N/A
Income - Other trading activities £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Charitable activities £217.28k N/A £28.82k £0 N/A
Income - Endowments £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Investment £1.46k N/A £1.03k £16.72k N/A
Income - Other £34.42k N/A £0 £0 N/A
Income - Legacies £197.49k N/A £725.61k £550.90k N/A
Expenditure - Charitable activities £956.44k N/A £587.81k £812.86k N/A
Expenditure - Raising funds £499.36k N/A £158.07k £169.38k N/A
Expenditure - Governance £22.03k N/A £11.16k £360.89k N/A
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 N/A £154.35k £451.97k N/A
Expenditure - Investment management £90.85k N/A £0 £7.56k N/A
Expenditure - Other £0 N/A £0 £0 N/A