OCEAN STARS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
TO RELIEVE SUFFERING AMONG DISADVANTAGED SRI LANKAN PEOPLE. WE AIM TO DO THIS BY PROVIDING THE PEOPLE WITH THE SKILLS NECESSARY TO REBUILD THEIR LIVES.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Other Finance
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Hampshire
- Sri Lanka
Governance
- 15 June 2005: Standard registration
- OCEANS STARS TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
JOHN STUART BUNTER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rachel Angel | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Denise Barnes | Trustee | 18 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Cameron Williams | Trustee | 20 January 2022 |
|
|
||||
Daniel Haylett | Trustee | 26 November 2015 |
|
|||||
Jennie Gilbert | Trustee | 24 July 2015 |
|
|
||||
JOANNA ELIZABETH BARTON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £110.48k | £91.04k | £104.67k | £112.70k | £135.08k | |
|
Total expenditure | £111.23k | £71.55k | £118.04k | £117.66k | £125.54k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | 17 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | 05 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | 20 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | 28 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | 17 December 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 21 APRIL 2005 AS AMENDED ON 13 JUL 2017 AS AMENDED BY RESOLUTION DATED 28 MAY 2021 as amended on 15 Apr 2022 as amended on 03 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
The relief of financial need and suffering among victims of natural and other kinds of disaster in the form of money (or other means deemed suitable) for persons, bodies or organisations in Sri Lanka, and the provision of educational opportunities for all children in Sri Lanka.
Area of benefit
SRI LANKA
Contact information
- Address:
-
2 NETHERHOUSE MOOR
CHURCH CROOKHAM
FLEET
GU51 5TY
- Phone:
- 01252 692248
- Email:
- dilanee@ntlworld.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window