Financial history ELSTOW BUNYAN CHRISTIAN FELLOWSHIP

Charity number: 1114128
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023 31/12/2024
Total gross income £24.21k £44.20k £22.13k £39.28k £31.21k
Total expenditure £12.69k £48.30k £30.98k £25.36k £31.90k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A