Trustees GLOBAL ALLIANCE FOR LIVESTOCK VETERINARY MEDICINES
Charity number: 1115606

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
8 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Professor Philip Thornton | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Cheikh Ly | Trustee | 12 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Henry Matukho Wamwayi | Trustee | 14 September 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr Fabian Martin Kausche | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alice Hope Banga | Trustee | 15 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Shraman Jha | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Junaidu Maina | Trustee | 17 September 2019 |
|
|
||||
Dr Isabelle Dieuzy-Labaye | Trustee | 20 September 2018 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.