ST CATHERINE'S TRUST FOR TRADITIONAL CATHOLIC EDUCATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advancing the Roman Catholic religion in accordance with the traditional liturgy, and for the benefit of the public; through the provision of a summer school free of cost to students, and a family retreat, and also by undertaking the administration of annual Latin and Gregorian Chant courses on behalf of the Latin Mass Society and Gregorian Chant Network respectively.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 06 May 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Provides Services
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 12 July 2005: Standard registration
- SAINT CATHERINE'S TRUST FOR TRADITIONAL CATHOLIC EDUCATION (Working name)
- SCT (Working name)
- ST CATHERINE'S TRUST (Working name)
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DR THE HONOURABLE ALEXANDER JOSEPH RANALD SHAW | Trustee |
|
||||||
REVEREND FATHER DAVID ANDREW SOUTHWELL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
LUCY AGATHA SHAW | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 06/05/2019 | 06/05/2020 | 06/05/2021 | 06/05/2022 | 06/05/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £15.37k | £17.74k | £1.96k | £9.10k | £17.15k | |
|
Total expenditure | £16.36k | £15.14k | £3.50k | £5.68k | £15.55k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 06 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 May 2024 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 83 days | |
Annual return | 06 May 2023 | 09 November 2024 | 248 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 May 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 May 2022 | 29 August 2023 | 176 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 May 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 May 2021 | 04 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 May 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 06 May 2020 | 25 January 2022 | 325 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 06 May 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 DECEMBER 2004
Charitable objects
(I) TO ADVANCE THE ROMAN CATHOLIC RELIGION FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC AND IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE TRADITIONAL LITURGY, DEVOTIONS AND DOCTRINES OF THE ROMAN CATHOLIC CHURCH, THROUGH THE HOLDING OF RELIGIOUS SERVICES, THROUGH THE SPONSORSHIP AND ORGANISATION OF PILGRIMAGES, RETREATS AND LECTURES, AND THROUGH THE PROVISION OF CATECHESIS AND EDUCATION IN ACCORDANCE WITH TRADITIONAL CATHOLICISM; AND BY PRODUCING AND DISTRIBUTING LITERATURE ON ALL ASPECTS OF THE CATHOLIC TRADITION. (II) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC THROUGH THE PROVISION OF GRANTS AND BURSARIES FOR STUDENTS IN FINANCIAL NEED PURSUING STUDIES AT UNIVERSITIES AND COLLEGES OF HIGHER AND FURTHER EDUCATION.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
ST BEDE'S PRESBYTERY
58 THORNTON ROAD
CLAPHAM PARK
LONDON
SW12 0LF
- Phone:
- 07913 481014
- Email:
- info@stcatherinestrust.org
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window