THE TWENTIETH CENTURY SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Twentieth Century Society is a membership organisation, open to all, which campaigns for the conservation of the best c20th architecture. It was founded in 1979 as The Thirties Society and is now recognised by government and has a statutory role in the planning process in England. It organises lectures, conference and study tours in the UK and abroad
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
Total income includes £47,043 from 2 government grant(s)
People

16 Trustee(s)
56 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 28 June 2005: Standard registration
- C20 SOCIETY (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
16 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hugh Geoffrey Pearman | Chair | 08 July 2023 |
|
|
||||
Adam Jay Coleman | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|||||
Hiba Alobaydi | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Mx Phineas Grant Harper | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Emma Louise England | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Peter Parkes | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Colin Mitchell | Trustee | 06 July 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jeremy Gostick | Trustee | 11 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Mark Eastment | Trustee | 31 October 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr OTTO SAUMAREZ SMITH | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW THOMAS JACKSON | Trustee | 15 June 2019 |
|
|
||||
Cela Selley | Trustee | 17 June 2017 |
|
|
||||
Sarah Jane Jackson | Trustee | 18 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
Ellen Gates | Trustee | 13 June 2015 |
|
|
||||
Dr Alan Powers | Trustee | 14 June 2014 |
|
|
||||
CAROLYN PARMETER | Trustee | 26 June 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £354.27k | £249.07k | £297.11k | £332.25k | £403.41k | |
|
Total expenditure | £343.31k | £265.44k | £305.55k | £340.71k | £413.15k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £40.58k | £37.28k | £40.81k | £41.44k | £47.04k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 09 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 20 October 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 05 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 22 September 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 30 September 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 12/01/2005 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 26/05/2012 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 01/06/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/06/2015
Charitable objects
(1) TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC IN THE APPRECIATION, KNOWLEDGE AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE ARTS, ARCHITECTURE, CRAFTS AND DESIGN FOR THE PERIOD AFTER 1914; (2) TO ENCOURAGE THE STUDY OF THESE AND OF THE RELATED SOCIAL HISTORY AND TO AFFORD ADVICE TO OWNERS AND PUBLIC AUTHORITIES WITH REGARD TO THE PRESERVATION AND REPAIR OF ANY BUILDINGS CONSTRUCTED OR DESIGNED DURING THIS PERIOD; (3) TO SAVE FROM NEEDLESS DESTRUCTION OR DISFIGUREMENT, BUILDINGS OR GROUPS OF BUILDINGS, INTERIORS AND ARTEFACTS DESIGNED OR CONSTRUCTED AFTER 1914.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
70 COWCROSS STREET
LONDON
EC1M 6EJ
- Phone:
- 0207 250 3857
- Website:
-
c20society.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window