SEVENOAKS AND SWANLEY CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU LTD
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To give free, confidential and independent advice concerning all social, domestic and personal issues such as housing, employment, benefits, debt, divorce, nationality and immigration.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2015
Total income includes £84,700 from government grant(s)
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Other Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Kent
Governance
- 19 July 2005: Standard registration
- 12 December 2015: Removed (Amalgamated)
- 12 December 2015: Funds transferred to 1082979 CITIZENS ADVICE IN NORTH & WEST KENT
- SWANLEY & DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU LTD (Previous name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | 31/03/2014 | 30/04/2015 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £151.33k | £119.42k | £112.24k | £160.90k | £206.49k | |
|
Total expenditure | £147.69k | £158.02k | £109.73k | £137.16k | £173.73k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £0 | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £84.70k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2015 | 08 December 2015 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2015 | 08 December 2015 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | 10 November 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | 10 November 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 16 December 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 10 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 18 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 18 January 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 FEBRUARY 2005 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION OF CHANGE ON NAME DATED 20 APRIL 2009
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE OF ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE COMMUNITY IN SWANLEY AND THE NORTHERN PARISHES OF SEVENOAKS DISTRICT COUNCIL AREA ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT") BY THE ADVANCEMENT OF EDUCATION, THE PROTECTION AND PRESERVATION OF HEALTH AND THE RELIEF OF POVERTY, SICKNESS AND DISTRESS.
Area of benefit
SWANLEY AND THE NORTHERN PARISHES OF SEVENOAKS DISTRICT COUNCIL AREA.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window