THE FACEFAX ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The relief of sickness & the preservation & protection of good health of those suffering, & their carers, from maxillo-facial diseases, & other types of cancer, providing information, complementary therapies, emotional support & practical help. Also, to advance the education of the public & medical professionals, in the prevention & treatment of maxillo-facial diseases & other types of cancer.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 April 2024
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 September 2005: Standard registration
- 02 September 2009: Removed (Does not operate)
- 21 September 2009: Standard registration
- F (Working name)
- FACEFAX (Working name)
- Conflicting interests
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
PAULINE GIBBINGS | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Rosemary Dale Shaw | Trustee | 17 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Dr HELEN MARY COGHILL | Trustee | 09 May 2016 |
|
|||||
ANNE HICKS | Trustee |
|
||||||
CAROL DUNSTONE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
BILL DEARNS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SOPHIA CHANDLER | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/04/2020 | 30/04/2021 | 30/04/2022 | 30/04/2023 | 30/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £10.91k | £6.18k | £1.06k | £3.16k | £428 | |
|
Total expenditure | £12.91k | £6.71k | £1.83k | £1.49k | £2.34k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 April 2024 | 11 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2023 | 19 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2022 | 15 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2021 | 09 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 April 2020 | 04 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 12/06/2005 AS AMENDED ON 19/09/2005 AS AMENDED ON 03/11/2014
Charitable objects
(1) THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS AND THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF GOOD HEALTH OF THOSE SUFFERING AND THEIR CARERS, FROM MAXILLOFACIAL DISEASES AND OTHER TYPES OF CANCER, BY THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, COMPLEMENTARY THERAPIES, EMOTIONAL SUPPORT AND PRACTICAL HELP. (2) TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE PUBLIC AND MEDICAL PROFESSIONALS, IN THE PREVENTION AND TREATMENT OF MAXILLOFACIAL DISEASES AND OTHER TYPES OF CANCER.
Area of benefit
NATIONALLY.
Contact information
- Address:
-
35 Palmerston Road
NORTHAMPTON
NN1 5EU
- Phone:
- 07541998711
- Email:
- secretary@facefax.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window