Financial history DUNSTABLE AND DISTRICT CITIZENS ADVICE BUREAU

Charity number: 1110676
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £170.63k £182.55k £178.30k £230.08k £264.94k
Total expenditure £161.67k £176.42k £183.98k £182.99k £217.25k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £99.14k N/A £103.28k £142.49k N/A