NDI MOYO

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Sponsor the development and operation of the Ndi Moyo Palliative Care Centre, Salima, Malawi
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
12 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Malawi
Governance
- 25 August 2005: Standard registration
No other names
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Dr HELEN COX | Chair | 03 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Alexandra Lindsay-Perez | Trustee | 25 November 2023 |
|
|
||||
Chupa Phiri | Trustee | 03 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Barbara Lynn Brooks-Smith | Trustee | 20 March 2021 |
|
|||||
Dr Julia Bognar | Trustee | 29 July 2020 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eleanor Cook | Trustee | 16 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Pollock | Trustee | 17 November 2018 |
|
|
||||
Cecelia Mary Pollock | Trustee | 25 June 2016 |
|
|
||||
BRIDGET MULLENS | Trustee | 06 February 2013 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW JAMES EDWARD HOLDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £69.17k | £77.97k | £70.88k | £75.65k | £98.90k | |
|
Total expenditure | £94.20k | £73.86k | £97.65k | £85.91k | £112.31k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 17 July 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 June 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 16 August 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 25 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 06 May 2021 | 95 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 06 May 2021 | 95 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 2 JUNE 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE THE PHYSICAL AND MENTAL HEALTH OF THE CHRONICALLY AND TERMINALLY ILL IN THE SALIMA AREA AND ADJACENT DISTRICTS IN MALAWI, AFRICA, THROUGH THE PROVISION OF FINANCIAL ASSISTANCE, SUPPORT, CARE, EDUCATION AND PRACTICAL ADVICE.
Area of benefit
SALIMA AREA AND ADJACENT DISTRICTS IN MALAWI, AFRICA
Contact information
- Address:
-
53 UPLANDS ROAD
LONDON
N8 9NH
- Phone:
- 07894423272
- Email:
- enquiries@ndimoyo.org
- Website:
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window