Ethiopian Community in the West Midlands

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Advice and guidance for refugees and asylum seekers in the areas of immigration, welfare benefit, housing, health, etc. Children and youth activities including after school classes, outings, sport and leisure (including physical), football, community events. Our activities cover the whole West Midlands area although we are based in Birmingham city.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Sandwell
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 10 January 2006: Standard registration
- ECWM (Working name)
- ETHIOPIAN COMMUNITY (Working name)
- ETHIOPIAN COMMUNITY IN THE WEST MIDLANDS (Previous name)
- THE BLACK LIONS COMMUNITY LINK (Previous name)
- Financial Conduct Authority
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Tesfaye Solomon | Chair | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Wendewesen Jembere Gelaye | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Eyob Balcha Gebremariam | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|||||
Aynalem Negash | Trustee | 04 January 2024 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 17 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 06 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 27 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 01/05/2003 AS AMENDED ON 23/11/2005 AS AMENDED ON 14/12/2005 AS AMENDED ON 15/01/2012 as amended on 04 Jan 2025
Charitable objects
(1)THE CHARITY’S MAIN OBJECTS ARE THE RELIEF OF THE MIGRANT COMMUNITIES (REFUGEES, ASYLUM SEEKERS, OTHER RECENT MIGRANTS) FROM EASTERN AFRICA IN THE WEST MIDLANDS REGION, WHO ARE IN CONDITION OF POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS, IN PARTICULAR BY PROVIDING ADVICE, REPRESENTATION, TRANSLATION AND INTERPRETING SERVICES IN MATTERS SUCH AS ASYLUM AND IMMIGRATION, WELFARE BENEFITS, HOUSING, HEALTH EDUCATION, TRAINING AND EMPLOYMENT. (2)THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE EDUCATION OF NEW COMERS FROM EASTERN AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS, IN ORDER TO ASSIST THEIR INCLUSION IN THE WIDER COMMUNITY. (3)TO MAINTAIN THE UNITY AND SOCIAL COHESION OF THE MIGRANT COMMUNITY FROM EASTERN AFRICA IN THE WEST MIDLANDS BY ORGANIZING SOCIAL EVENTS AND REFUGEE WEEK AND GET TOGETHER EVENTS TO INTEGRATE THEM IN SOCIETY (4)TO DEVELOP THE CAPACITY AND SKILLS OF THE MEMBERS OF SOCIETY AND ECONOMICALLY DISADVANTAGED MIGRANTS FROM EASTERN AFRICA IN THE WEST MIDLANDS IN SUCH A WAY THAT THEY ARE BETTER ABLE TO IDENTIFY, AND HELP MEET THEIR NEEDS TO PARTICIPATE MORE FULLY IN SOCIETY. (5)TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE WEST MIDLANDS AND ITS NEIGHBOURHOOD WITH A VIEW TO THE PRESERVATION OF PUBLIC ORDER, THE PROVISION OF SERVICES FOR MEDIATION AND CONCILIATION BETWEEN MIGRANTS FROM EASTERN AFRICA, IN PARTICULAR REFUGEES AND ASYLUM SEEKERS, ORGANISATIONS AND GROUPS WHO ARE INVOLVED IN DISPUTES OR INTERPERSONAL CONFLICTS WHERE THAT DISPUTE OR CONFLICT RESULTS FROM OR MAY LEAD TO ACTS OF NUISANCE, VANDALISM, RACIAL ABUSE OR BREACH OF THE PEACE. (6) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE OF MIGRANT ORIGINS FROM EASTERN AFRICA, UP TO THE AGE OF 25, LIVING IN WEST MIDLANDS BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: •DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES, •ADVANCING EDUCATION, •RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT AND •PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY
Area of benefit
WEST MIDLANDS
Contact information
- Address:
-
54 Deer Park Way
BIRMINGHAM
B33 8EW
- Phone:
- 07411954610
- Email:
- ethiocomwm@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window