Financial history THE DEEPING MEN'S GROUP CHARITIES FUND LIMITED

Charity Number: 1111361
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023 31/07/2024
Total gross income £14.40k £11.20k £12.17k £19.72k £16.02k
Total expenditure £15.17k £13.12k £11.64k £15.75k £14.20k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A